Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Bemile

Bishop Emeritus of Wa, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1939 Born
3 Aug 196828.6Ordained PriestPriest of Wa, Ghana
19 Dec 199454.9AppointedBishop of Wa, Ghana
25 Mar 199555.2Ordained BishopBishop of Wa, Ghana
17 Feb 201676.1RetiredBishop of Wa, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Paul Bemile (VIAF: 3086018)
Bishop Paul Bemile (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Wa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKokoligu

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,538
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast