Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gregory E. Kpiebaya

Archbishop Emeritus of Tamale, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1933 Born
8 Sep 196229.6Ordained PriestPriest of Wa, Ghana
18 Nov 197441.8AppointedBishop of Wa, Ghana
15 Mar 197542.2Ordained BishopBishop of Wa, Ghana
26 Mar 199461.2AppointedArchbishop of Tamale, Ghana
12 Feb 200976.1RetiredArchbishop of Tamale, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Gregory E. Kpiebaya
Archbishop Gregory E. Kpiebaya (born 1933) Archbishop Emeritus of Tamale

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKaleo

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Tamale.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Feb 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast