Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Kwadwo Owusu

Deceased

Bishop of Sunyani


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1927BornKwasibuokrom
8 Dec 195629.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Mar 197345.2AppointedBishop of Sunyani, Ghana
30 Jun 197345.5Ordained BishopBishop of Sunyani, Ghana
28 Dec 200174.0DiedBishop of Sunyani, Ghana

MicroData Summary for James Kwadwo Owusu:
Bishop James Kwadwo Owusu (born , died ) Bishop of Sunyani

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013