Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincent Sowah Boi-Nai, S.V.D.

Bishop of Yendi, Ghana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jan 1945 Born
13 Aug 197732.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
16 Mar 199954.2AppointedBishop of Yendi, Ghana
10 Jul 199954.5Ordained BishopBishop of Yendi, Ghana

MicroData Summary for Vincent Sowah Boi-Nai
Bishop Vincent Sowah Boi-Nai S.V.D. (born ) Bishop of Yendi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLabadi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Yendi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 156, Number 13,582
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • mn: CB, 15 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast