Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Valentino Vailati

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia-Vieste, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1914Born
22 Aug 193723.1Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
8 Dec 196046.4AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
6 Mar 196146.6Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
25 May 197055.9AppointedArchbishop of Manfredonia (e Vieste), Italy
2 Jun 199075.9RetiredArchbishop of Manfredonia-Vieste, Italy
1 Feb 199883.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia-Vieste, Italy

MicroData Summary for Valentino Vailati
Archbishop Valentino Vailati (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Manfredonia-Vieste

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 60.4 years
  • a bishop for 36.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 4 Aug 2018

Quantcast