Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michael Meier, S.V.D.

Archbishop Emeritus of Mount Hagen


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1928 BornWolfshausen, Germany
30 May 195728.6Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
2 Jul 198455.7AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mount Hagen, Papua New Guinea
15 Aug 198455.8Ordained BishopCoadjutor Archbishop of Mount Hagen, Papua New Guinea
7 Mar 198758.4SucceededArchbishop of Mount Hagen, Papua New Guinea
17 Jul 200677.7RetiredArchbishop of Mount Hagen, Papua New Guinea

MicroData Summary for Michael Meier:
Archbishop Michael Meier S.V.D. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mount Hagen

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mount Hagen.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 20 Sep 2013