Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Adrian Thomas Smith, S.M.

Archbishop Emeritus of Honiara, Solomon Islands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 May 1940 Born
26 Mar 196625.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
19 Feb 198342.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Honiara, Solomon Islands
19 Feb 198342.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
24 Apr 198342.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vissalsa
3 Dec 198444.5AppointedArchbishop of Honiara, Solomon Islands
27 Jan 198544.7InstalledArchbishop of Honiara, Solomon Islands
22 Jun 201676.1RetiredArchbishop of Honiara, Solomon Islands

MicroData Summary for Adrian Thomas Smith
Archbishop Adrian Thomas Smith S.M. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Honiara

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDublin, Ireland

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Honiara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 22 Jun 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 9 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Oct 2018

Quantcast