Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Carmen Di Pietro Pésolo, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Sonsonate, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Sep 1928Born
21 Sep 195729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
2 Jun 198657.7AppointedBishop of Sonsonate, El Salvador
16 Aug 198657.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sonsonate, El Salvador
30 May 198960.7DiedBishop of Sonsonate, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for José Carmen Di Pietro Pésolo
Bishop José Carmen Di Pietro Pésolo S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Sonsonate

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFoggia, Italy

  • a priest for 31.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,407
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast