Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Adolfo Mojica Morales

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sonsonate, El Salvador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1936Born
25 Oct 196428.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Nov 198953.1AppointedBishop of Sonsonate, El Salvador
20 Jan 199053.3Ordained BishopBishop of Sonsonate, El Salvador
8 Oct 201175.0RetiredBishop of Sonsonate, El Salvador
2 Mar 201275.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Sonsonate, El Salvador

MicroData Summary for José Adolfo Mojica Morales
Bishop José Adolfo Mojica Morales (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sonsonate

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCantón Nancintepeque

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 8 Oct 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,584
  • d: CB, 2 Mar 2012
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018