Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís Gonzaga da Cunha Marelim, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caxias do Maranhão, Maranho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Apr 1904BornSalvador
11 Jun 192723.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
19 Jul 194137.3AppointedBishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
7 Sep 194137.4Ordained BishopBishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
18 Feb 198176.8RetiredBishop of Caxias do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
21 Dec 199187.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Caxias do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luís Gonzaga da Cunha Marelim:
Bishop Luís Gonzaga da Cunha Marelim C.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caxias do Maranhão

  • a priest for 64.5 years
  • a bishop for 50.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013