Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Severino Vieira de Melo

Deceased

Archbishop of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jun 1880Born
4 Jan 190322.5Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 192343.0AppointedBishop of Piaui, Brazil
25 Nov 192343.4Ordained BishopBishop of Piaui, Brazil
9 Aug 195272.1AppointedArchbishop of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil
27 May 195574.9DiedArchbishop of Teresina, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Severino Vieira de Melo
Archbishop Severino Vieira de Melo (born , died ) Archbishop of Teresina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVitoria de Santo Antão

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1923, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast