Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joaquim Antônio de Almeida

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Natal

Titular Bishop of Lares


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1868BornGoianinha
12 Dec 189426.3Ordained PriestPriest
14 Dec 190537.3AppointedBishop of Piaui, Brazil
4 Feb 190637.5Ordained BishopBishop of Piaui, Brazil
12 Mar 190637.6InstalledBishop of Piaui, Brazil
23 Oct 191042.2AppointedBishop of Natal, Brazil
14 Jun 191546.8ResignedBishop of Natal, Brazil
14 Jun 191546.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Lares
1 Apr 194778.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Natal, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Joaquim Antônio de Almeida:
Bishop Joaquim Antônio de Almeida (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Natal

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013