Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo José Herberhold, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jun 1872Born
17 Sep 189523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
7 Jan 192855.5AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Santarém, Para, Brazil
7 Jan 192855.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
6 May 192855.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
30 Jan 193158.5AppointedBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil
24 Jul 193967.0DiedBishop of Ilhéus, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Eduardo José Herberhold
Bishop Eduardo José Herberhold O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Ilhéus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLippstadt, Germany

  • a priest for 43.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1928, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast