Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Barra (do Rio Grande)

Dioecesis Barrensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Luís Flávio Cappio, O.F.M., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 20 October 1913
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Feira de Santana
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Bahia
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 44,987 (17,376 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Nordeste III
  • Mailing Address: Rua Dr. Augusto Torres 02, C.P. 12, 47100-000 Barra, BA, Brazil
  • Telephone: (074)3662-2014
  • Fax: (same)

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
20 October 1913ErectedArchdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia Diocese of Barra (do Rio Grande) (erected)
14 November 1959Territory LostDiocese of Barra (do Rio Grande)
Diocese of Bonfim
Diocese of Caetité
Archdiocese of São Salvador da Bahia
Diocese of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa) (erected)
22 July 1962Territory LostDiocese of Barra (do Rio Grande) Diocese of Bom Jesus da Lapa (erected)
28 April 1979Territory LostDiocese of Barra (do Rio Grande)
Diocese of Ruy Barbosa (Rui Barbosa)
Diocese of Irecê (erected)
21 May 1979Territory LostDiocese of Barra (do Rio Grande) Diocese of Barreiras (erected)
16 January 2002Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Barra (do Rio Grande) (from Sao Salvador da Bahia)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1959500,000511,00097.8%891729,41192720ap1960
1961548,000550,00099.6%1091928,842102319ap1967
1968280,000287,28197.5%71835,0001105ap1971
1976398,800400,00099.7%941330,6764209ap1977
1980200,000235,50784.9%551020,0005218ap1981
1990170,000210,00081.0%25724,2856409ap1991
1999242,000253,00095.7%591417,28511359ap2000
2000245,000256,00095.7%771417,50093010ap2001
2001247,000259,00095.4%871516,466103210ap2002
2002251,000262,00095.8%561122,81882810ap2003
2003230,000250,00092.0%571219,166103610ap2004
2004230,000250,00092.0%571219,166103510ap2005
2006236,000256,00092.2%641023,60062610ap2007
2012252,000280,00090.0%1341714,82372311ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014