Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Patrick Boles

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Titular Bishop of Nova Sparsa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1930Born
2 Feb 195525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
14 Apr 199262.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
14 Apr 199262.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nova Sparsa
21 May 199262.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nova Sparsa
12 Oct 200676.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
9 Oct 201484.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for John Patrick Boles
Bishop John Patrick Boles (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Boston

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Ordained BishopHoly Cross, Cathedral, Boston, Archdiocese of Boston, Massachusetts

  • a priest for 59.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,682
  • d: CB, 9 Oct 2014
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 221, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast