Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Richard Sheets, S.J. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA

Titular Bishop of Murcona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Sep 1922Born
17 Jun 195330.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
14 May 199168.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
14 May 199168.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Murcona
25 Jun 199168.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Murcona
23 Sep 199775.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA
16 Apr 200380.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Indiana, USA

MicroData Summary for John Richard Sheets
Bishop John Richard Sheets S.J. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Fort Wayne-South Bend

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOmaha, NE, Diocese of Omaha, Nebraska

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126, Number 11,408
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast