Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Joseph Keyes, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Savannah, Georgia, USA

Titular Bishop of Areopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1876Born
21 Jun 190731.3Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
27 Jun 192246.3AppointedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
18 Oct 192246.6Ordained BishopBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
23 Sep 193559.5ResignedBishop of Savannah, Georgia, USA
23 Sep 193559.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Areopolis
31 Jul 195983.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Savannah, Georgia, USA

MicroData Summary for Michael Joseph Keyes
Bishop Michael Joseph Keyes S.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Savannah

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDingle, Ireland

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 36.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast