Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Joseph Mardaga

Deceased

Bishop of Wilmington, Delaware


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1913BornBaltimore, MD
14 May 194027.0Ordained PriestPriest of Baltimore-Washington, Maryland, USA
9 Dec 196653.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Baltimore, Maryland, USA
9 Dec 196653.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Mutugenna
25 Jan 196753.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mutugenna
9 Mar 196854.8AppointedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA
28 May 198471.0DiedBishop of Wilmington, Delaware, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas Joseph Mardaga:
Bishop Thomas Joseph Mardaga (born , died ) Bishop of Wilmington

  • a priest for 44.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013