Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick Joseph Barry

Deceased

Bishop of Saint Augustine, Florida


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1868BornLauragh, Ireland
9 Jun 189526.6Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
22 Feb 192253.3AppointedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
3 May 192253.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
13 Aug 194071.7DiedBishop of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA

MicroData Summary for Patrick Joseph Barry:
Bishop Patrick Joseph Barry (born , died ) Bishop of Saint Augustine

  • a priest for 45.2 years
  • a bishop for 18.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1922, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013