Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Croteau, O.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Mackenzie-Fort Smith, Northwest Territories


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1932 BornThetford Mines
8 Sep 195623.9ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
31 Aug 195825.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
24 Jan 198653.3AppointedBishop of Mackenzie-Fort Smith, Northwest Territories, Canada
8 Jun 198653.6Ordained BishopBishop of Mackenzie-Fort Smith, Northwest Territories, Canada
14 May 200370.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada
5 Jan 200673.2ResignedApostolic Administrator of Whitehorse, Yukon, Canada
10 May 200875.5RetiredBishop of Mackenzie-Fort Smith, Northwest Territories, Canada

MicroData Summary for Denis Croteau:
Bishop Denis Croteau O.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mackenzie-Fort Smith

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mackenzie-Fort Smith.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 26 Aug 2014