Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Henri Légaré, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Grouard-McLennan, Alberta, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Feb 1918Born
29 Jun 194325.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
13 Jul 196749.3AppointedBishop of Labrador-Schefferville, Québec, Canada
9 Sep 196749.5Ordained BishopBishop of Labrador-Schefferville, Québec, Canada
21 Nov 197254.7AppointedArchbishop of Grouard-McLennan, Alberta, Canada
16 Jul 199678.4ResignedArchbishop of Grouard-McLennan, Alberta, Canada
19 Jul 200486.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Grouard-McLennan, Alberta, Canada

MicroData Summary for Henri Légaré
Archbishop Henri Légaré O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Grouard-McLennan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWillow Bunch

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast