Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Omer Alfred Robidoux, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson, Manitoba, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1913Born
29 Jun 193925.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
7 Mar 197056.2AppointedBishop of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson, Manitoba, Canada
21 May 197056.4Ordained BishopBishop of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson, Manitoba, Canada
12 Nov 198672.8DiedBishop of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson, Manitoba, Canada

MicroData Summary for Omer Alfred Robidoux
Bishop Omer Alfred Robidoux O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop of Churchill-Baie d’Hudson

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Pierre-Jolys

  • a priest for 47.3 years
  • a bishop for 16.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast