Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Tomás Mazarrasa y Rivas

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

Titular Bishop of Philippopolis in Thracia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1823Born
21 Feb 188561.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain
21 Feb 188561.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
19 Apr 188562.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
11 Mar 190784.0DiedApostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Tomás Mazarrasa y Rivas
Bishop José Tomás Mazarrasa y Rivas (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Ciudad Rodrigo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSetién, Diocese of Santander
Ordained BishopN.S. de la Ensenanza, Santander, Diocese of Santander
Death PlaceSantander, Diocese of Santander

  • a bishop for 21.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 206, and Page 453
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 16
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017