Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Juan Campins y Barceló

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1859Born
25 Mar 188223.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 May 189839.3AppointedBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain
18 Jul 189839.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain
23 Feb 191556.1DiedBishop of Mallorca y Ibiza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Juan Campins y Barceló (VIAF: 257477206)
Bishop Pedro Juan Campins y Barceló (born , died ) Bishop of Mallorca y Ibiza

EventPlace
Birth PlacePalma de Mallorca
Ordained BishopSan Miguel, Madrid, Diocese of Madrid

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 360
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017