Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José María Caparrós y López

Deceased

Bishop of Sigüenza, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1838Born
1862²23.2Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 189657.7AppointedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
2 Aug 189657.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sigüenza, Spain
27 Jan 189758.3DiedBishop of Sigüenza, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José María Caparrós y López
Bishop José María Caparrós y López (born , died ) Bishop of Sigüenza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCehegín, Diocese of Cartagena (en España)
Ordained BishopOrder of Friars Preachers, Church, Vergara

  • a priest for 35.0 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 511
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 42

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017