Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Álvarez y Miranda

Deceased

Bishop of León, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1850Born
17 Dec 187525.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Jul 191362.6AppointedBishop of León, Spain
21 Nov 191362.9Ordained BishopBishop of León, Spain
4 Mar 193786.2DiedBishop of León, Spain

MicroData Summary for José Álvarez y Miranda
Bishop José Álvarez y Miranda (born , died ) Bishop of León

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMiñera

  • a priest for 61.2 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast