Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrique Cardinal Almaraz y Santos

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1847Born
1874²26.2Ordained PriestPriest of Salamanca, Spain
19 Jan 189345.3AppointedBishop of Palencia, Spain
16 Apr 189345.5Ordained BishopBishop of Palencia, Spain
18 Apr 190759.5AppointedArchbishop of Sevilla {Seville}, Spain
27 Nov 191164.1Elevated to Cardinal
2 Dec 191265.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Montorio
16 Dec 192073.2AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
22 Jan 192274.3DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Enrique Almaraz y Santos (VIAF: 310659154)
Enrique Cardinal Almaraz y Santos (born , died ) Archbishop of Toledo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Vellés, Diocese of Salamanca
Ordained PriestSalamanca, Diocese of Salamanca
Ordained BishopS. Isidro, Cathedral, Madrid
Death PlaceMadrid
Buried Place (Original)Santa Teresa chapel, Cathedral, Toledo, Archdiocese of Toledo

  • a priest for 48.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.7 years
  • a cardinal for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 435
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1893, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017