Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Manuel de Castro y Alonso

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1864BornValladolid
27 Dec 188521.7Ordained PriestPriest
28 Oct 191349.5AppointedBishop of Jaca, Spain
27 Dec 191349.7Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
9 Jul 192056.2AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
21 May 192864.1AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
3 Sep 194480.4DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

MicroData Summary for Manuel de Castro y Alonso:
Archbishop Manuel de Castro y Alonso (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 73

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 22 Jul 2014