Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Cadena y Eleta

Deceased

Archbishop of Burgos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Mar 1855BornPitillas
1880¹24.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 Apr 190146.1AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
7 Jul 190146.3Ordained BishopBishop of Segovia, Spain
14 Nov 190449.7AppointedBishop of Vitoria, Spain
18 Jul 191358.3AppointedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain
4 Jun 191863.2DiedArchbishop of Burgos, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for José Cadena y Eleta:
Archbishop José Cadena y Eleta (born , died ) Archbishop of Burgos

  • a priest for 38.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 509
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 33
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013