Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Teodorico Stöckler

Bishop Emeritus of Quilmes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1936 BornEichelborn, Germany
17 Dec 196024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
21 Nov 198549.6AppointedBishop of Goya, Argentina
17 Dec 198549.7Ordained BishopBishop of Goya, Argentina
21 Dec 198549.7InstalledBishop of Goya, Argentina
25 Feb 200265.9AppointedBishop of Quilmes, Argentina
12 Oct 201175.5RetiredBishop of Quilmes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Luis Teodorico Stöckler:
Bishop Luis Teodorico Stöckler (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Quilmes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quilmes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.4, 11 Nov 2013; data: 16 Dec 2013