Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manfred Grothe

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paderborn

Titular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1939 BornWarburg
11 Mar 196727.9Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
14 Oct 200465.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
14 Oct 200465.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
5 Dec 200465.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hippo Diarrhytus
26 Mar 201474.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Limburg, Germany
15 Jul 201576.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
18 Sep 201677.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Limburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Manfred Grothe
Bishop Manfred Grothe (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paderborn

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Paderborn.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Number 14,721
  • ab: Bollettino, 26 Mar 2014
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Jul 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 19 Sep 2016