Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Peter Leipzig

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Baker, Oregon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1895BornChilton, WI
14 Apr 192024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Oregon City, Oregon, USA
18 Jul 195055.1AppointedBishop of Baker City, Oregon, USA
12 Sep 195055.2Ordained BishopBishop of Baker City, Oregon, USA
26 Apr 197175.8RetiredBishop of Baker, Oregon, USA
17 Jan 198185.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Baker, Oregon, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Peter Leipzig:
Bishop Francis Peter Leipzig (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Baker

  • a priest for 60.8 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 68

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013