Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Joseph O’Reilly

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1860Born
29 Jun 189030.4Ordained PriestPriest of Oregon City, Oregon, USA
25 Jun 190343.4AppointedBishop of Baker City, Oregon, USA
25 Aug 190343.6Ordained BishopBishop of Baker City, Oregon, USA
20 Mar 191858.2AppointedBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA
4 Feb 192363.0DiedBishop of Lincoln, Nebraska, USA

MicroData Summary for Charles Joseph O’Reilly
Bishop Charles Joseph O’Reilly (born , died ) Bishop of Lincoln

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarleton, Canada

  • a priest for 32.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 138
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018