Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Raphael John Crimont, S.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Alaska, USA

Titular Bishop of Ammaedara


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1858Born
15 Aug 187517.5ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
26 Aug 188830.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Feb 189436.0Solemn VowsPriest of Society of Jesus
28 Mar 190446.1AppointedPrefect of Alaska, USA
15 Feb 191759.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Alaska, USA
22 Mar 191759.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Ammaedara
25 Jul 191759.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ammaedara
20 May 194587.2DiedVicar Apostolic of Alaska, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Raphael John Crimont
Bishop Joseph Raphael John Crimont S.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Alaska

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFerričres, France

  • a priest for 56.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 52
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1917, Number 38
  • c1: CB, 28 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast