Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gervazio Moses Chisendera

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dedza, Malawi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1928Born
4 Sep 196032.6Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jun 198456.4AppointedBishop of Dedza, Malawi
30 Sep 198456.7Ordained BishopBishop of Dedza, Malawi
7 Sep 200072.6ResignedBishop of Dedza, Malawi
14 Aug 200476.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Dedza, Malawi

MicroData Summary for Gervazio Moses Chisendera
Bishop Gervazio Moses Chisendera (born 1928, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dedza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuluzi-Minga

  • a priest for 43.9 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast