Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Medardo Joseph Cardinal Mazombwe

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Lusaka

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Emerenziana a Tor Fiorenza


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1931BornChundamira
4 Sep 196028.9Ordained PriestPriest
11 Nov 197039.1AppointedBishop of Chipata, Zambia
7 Feb 197139.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chipata, Zambia
30 Nov 199665.1AppointedArchbishop of Lusaka, Zambia
28 Oct 200675.0RetiredArchbishop of Lusaka, Zambia
20 Nov 201079.1Elevated to Cardinal
20 Nov 201079.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Emerenziana a Tor Fiorenza
26 Mar 201179.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Emerenziana a Tor Fiorenza
29 Aug 201381.9DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Lusaka, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Medardo Joseph Mazombwe:
Medardo Joseph Cardinal Mazombwe (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lusaka

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
  • a cardinal for 2.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Oct 2006
  • d: Bollettino, 30 Aug 2013
  • ob/c2/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015