Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Josephus Hubertus Gulielmus Lemmens

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Roermond, Netherlands

Titular Archbishop of Samosata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1884Born
26 Aug 190925.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
5 Feb 193247.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands
5 Feb 193247.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Cardicium
19 Mar 193247.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cardicium
26 Mar 193247.6SucceededBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
31 Dec 195773.4RetiredBishop of Roermond, Netherlands
31 Dec 195773.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Samosata
22 Jul 196075.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Roermond, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Josephus Hubertus Gulielmus Lemmens (VIAF: 81034649)
Archbishop Josephus Hubertus Gulielmus Lemmens (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Roermond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSchimmert, Diocese of Roermond

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 28.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017