Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop James Chiona

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Blantyre


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1924BornBandawe
12 Sep 195430.7Ordained PriestPriest of Blantyre, Malawi
11 Jan 196541.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Blantyre, Malawi
11 Jan 196541.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bacanaria
28 Mar 196541.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bacanaria
29 Nov 196743.9AppointedArchbishop of Blantyre, Malawi
23 Jan 200177.1RetiredArchbishop of Blantyre, Malawi
18 Aug 200884.6DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Blantyre, Malawi

MicroData Summary for James Chiona:
Archbishop James Chiona (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Blantyre

  • a priest for 53.9 years
  • a bishop for 43.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 196, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013