Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Aspe, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Cochabamba

Titular Bishop of Callinicum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1885BornAzcoaga, Spain
26 Jun 191024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
8 Jun 193145.7AppointedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
21 Jun 193145.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
21 Nov 194257.1ResignedBishop of Cochabamba, Bolivia
21 Nov 194257.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Callinicum
22 Jan 196276.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Cochabamba, Bolivia

MicroData Summary for Tomás Aspe:
Bishop Tomás Aspe O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Cochabamba

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1931, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013