Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Domitrovitsch, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Prelate of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Podalia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1893Born
18 Nov 192330.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
19 Dec 194956.7AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Rio Negro, Amazonas, Brazil
19 Dec 194956.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Podalia
19 Mar 195057.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Podalia
5 Aug 196168.3AppointedPrelate of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil
27 Feb 196268.9DiedPrelate of Humaitá, Amazonas, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Domitrovitsch
Bishop José Domitrovitsch S.D.B. (born , died ) Prelate of Humaitá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSomettendorf, Hungary

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 11.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1950, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast