Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís António Palha Teixeira, O.P. †

Deceased

Prelate Emeritus of Marabá, Para, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Lunda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1896Born
11 Apr 192528.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Jan 194851.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Brazil
20 Feb 195154.7AppointedPrelate of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Brazil
20 Feb 195154.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Lunda
13 May 195155.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lunda
10 Nov 197680.5RetiredPrelate of Marabá, Para, Brazil
21 Aug 198185.2DiedPrelate Emeritus of Marabá, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Luís António Palha Teixeira
Bishop Luís António Palha Teixeira O.P. (born , died ) Prelate Emeritus of Marabá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Rita de Rio Prêto

  • a priest for 56.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast