Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Volpi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo, Italy

Titular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Jan 1860Born
20 Aug 189737.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lucca, Italy
20 Aug 189737.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dionysias
5 Sep 189737.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dionysias
14 Nov 190444.7AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
3 Jul 191959.4ResignedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
3 Jul 191959.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Antiochia in Pisidia
19 Jun 193171.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Arezzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Volpi (VIAF: 51681085)
Archbishop Giovanni Volpi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLucca, Archdiocese of Lucca
Ordained BishopSan Martino, Cathedral, Lucca, Archdiocese of Lucca

  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 247
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 58, and Page 66
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1897, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017