Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Froilán Tiberio Casas Ortíz

Bishop of Neiva, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1948 Born
9 Dec 197224.5Ordained PriestPriest of Tunja, Colombia
4 Feb 201263.7AppointedBishop of Neiva, Colombia
24 Mar 201263.8Ordained BishopBishop of Neiva, Colombia
21 Apr 201263.9InstalledBishop of Neiva, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Froilán Tiberio Casas Ortíz
Bishop Froilán Tiberio Casas Ortíz (born ) Bishop of Neiva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiquinquirá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Neiva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 4 Feb 2012
  • ob/c23: CB, 6 Feb 2012
  • i: CB, 2 Mar 2012
  • ob: CB, 12 Mar 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,278

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 30 Jul 2017