Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Omar Alberto Sánchez Cubillos, O.P.

Archbishop of Popayán, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1963 Born
2 Feb 198925.3ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
17 Feb 199026.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
8 Jun 201147.7AppointedBishop of Tibú, Colombia
8 Aug 201147.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tibú, Colombia
3 Sep 201147.9InstalledBishop of Tibú, Colombia
12 Oct 202057.0AppointedArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia
12 Dec 202057.2InstalledArchbishop of Popayán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Omar Alberto Sánchez Cubillos
Archbishop Omar Alberto Sánchez Cubillos O.P. (born ) Archbishop of Popayán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCogua, Diocese of Zipaquirá
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora del Rosario, Basilica, Chiquinquirá

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Popayán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jun 2011
  • ob/i: CB, 8 Jun 2011
  • c2+: CB, 10 Aug 2011
  • c2+/i: CB, 13 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,124
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2020
  • i: AM, 19 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 20 Nov 2020

Quantcast