Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jaime Muñoz Pedroza

Bishop of Girardot, Colombia

Apostolic Administrator of Espinal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Sep 1958 Born
24 Nov 198426.1Ordained PriestPriest of Tunja, Colombia
22 Oct 201052.0AppointedBishop of Arauca, Colombia
4 Dec 201052.1Ordained BishopBishop of Arauca, Colombia
14 Dec 201052.2InstalledBishop of Arauca, Colombia
11 Jul 201859.7AppointedBishop of Girardot, Colombia
30 Aug 201859.9InstalledBishop of Girardot, Colombia
18 Jul 202061.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Espinal, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jaime Muñoz Pedroza
Bishop Jaime Muñoz Pedroza (born ) Bishop of Girardot

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCiénaga, Archdiocese of Tunja
Ordained BishopSantiago, Cathedral Basilica, Tunja, Archdiocese of Tunja

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Girardot.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 22 Oct 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,870
  • ab: Bollettino, 11 Jul 2018
  • aadm: CB, 5 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast