Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Foggia-Bovino

Archidioecesis Fodiana-Bovinensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giorgio Ferretti, Archbishop
  • Vincenzo Pelvi, Archbishop Emeritus
  • Francesco Pio Tamburrino, O.S.B., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • United: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,667 (643 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Puglia
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesifoggiabovino.it/
  • Mailing Address: Arcivescovado, Via G. Oberdan 13, 71121 Foggia, Italia
  • Telephone: 0881.76.62.02
  • Fax: 0881.72.32.71

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Foggia
25 June 1855ErectedDiocese of Troia Diocese of Foggia (erected)
Archdiocese of Foggia
30 April 1979ElevatedDiocese of Foggia Archdiocese of Foggia
Archdiocese of Foggia-Bovino
30 September 1986UnitedDiocese of Bovino
Archdiocese of Foggia
Archdiocese of Foggia-Bovino
1 January 1994Territory AddedDiocese of San Severo (Convento Maria SS.ma di Stignano (in S. Marco)) Archdiocese of Foggia-Bovino

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Foggia
188655,723.0%13308OTC
1949100,000115,00087.0%65401059527413718ap1951
1969153,346156,16598.2%61491101,3946935432ap1971
Archdiocese of Foggia
1980167,600172,60097.1%779116899712732538ap1981
Archdiocese of Foggia-Bovino
1990205,000208,36598.4%100841841,11419530254ap1991
1999186,145188,29098.9%82901721,08279725255ap2000
2000185,549187,64998.9%85801651,12478725055ap2001
2001185,420187,33899.0%86771631,13798424455ap2002
2002210,000212,50898.8%86741601,31298423055ap2003
2003217,000219,75098.7%88751631,331108522856ap2004
2004217,000219,20099.0%89751641,323108522455ap2005
2006217,100218,30099.5%90721621,34097921455ap2007
2013212,000215,00098.6%89651541,376107114955ap2014
2016211,800212,47099.7%84621461,450106512954ap2017
2019210,700210,89599.9%77371141,848134412454ap2020
2021208,200208,40099.9%73301032,021133210854ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Foggia
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 880
    • Crontassi Iconografia ed Araldica dell'Episcopato Pugliese, Page 178, to Page 182
  • Archdiocese of Foggia
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 71, Page 563, and Page 564
  • Archdiocese of Foggia-Bovino
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 710, to Page 712
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 86, Page 299

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024