Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Tilarán-Liberia

Dioecesis Tilaranensis-Liberianus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Vittorino Girardi Stellin, M.C.C.I., Bishop
  • Héctor Morera Vega, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Tilarán
22 July 1961ErectedDiocese of Alajuela Diocese of Tilarán (erected)
25 July 1995Territory LostDiocese of Alajuela
Diocese of Tilarán
Diocese of Ciudad Quesada (erected)
17 April 1998Territory LostDiocese of San Isidro de El General
Diocese of Tilarán
Diocese of Puntarenas (erected)
Diocese of Tilarán-Liberia
18 December 2010Name ChangedDiocese of Tilarán Diocese of Tilarán-Liberia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tilarán
1966247,139251,15498.4%255308,2375015ap1967
1970288,000300,00096.0%325377,78355317ap1971
1976301,000318,62694.5%366427,16664718ap1977
1980333,300352,38394.6%1852314,49154518ap1981
1990319,000328,00097.3%3613496,510135928ap1991
1999321,250329,25097.6%44447,3014421ap2000
2000337,000345,00097.7%571585,81014321ap2001
2001338,000347,00097.4%561575,92914321ap2002
2002339,500350,00097.0%542566,06224524ap2003
2003314,500370,00085.0%473506,29034424ap2004
2004318,750375,00085.0%413447,244136225ap2005
2010366,000430,00085.1%4610566,5354149234ap2011
Diocese of Tilarán-Liberia

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 17 Mar 2013