Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Germán Garcia Isaza, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Apartadó


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1936BornManizales
11 Feb 196225.4Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
21 Jul 197740.8AppointedPrefect of Tierradentro, Colombia
18 Jun 198851.7AppointedBishop of Caldas, Colombia
3 Aug 198851.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caldas, Colombia
1 Mar 200265.4AppointedBishop of Apartadó, Colombia
11 Oct 200670.1DiedBishop of Apartadó, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Germán Garcia Isaza:
Bishop Germán Garcia Isaza C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Apartadó

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 18.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,125
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015