Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joselito Carreño Quiñonez, M.X.Y.

Vicar Apostolic of Inírida

Titular Bishop of Paria in Proconsolare


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1966 BornCepitá
3 Dec 199125.6ProfessedMember of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
9 Nov 199630.6Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
3 Dec 201347.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Inírida, Colombia
3 Dec 201347.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Paria in Proconsolare
15 Feb 201447.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paria in Proconsolare

MicroData Summary for Joselito Carreño Quiñonez:
Bishop Joselito Carreño Quiñonez M.X.Y. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Inírida

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Inírida.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 16 Dec 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 16 Feb 2014