Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Medardo de Jesús Henao del Río, M.X.Y.

Vicar Apostolic of Mitú

Titular Bishop of Casae Medianae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1967 BornLiborina
3 Dec 199427.4ProfessedMember of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
4 Dec 199932.4Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
23 Nov 201346.4AppointedVicar Apostolic of Mitú, Colombia
23 Nov 201346.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
15 Feb 201446.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Casae Medianae
16 Mar 201446.7InstalledVicar Apostolic of Mitú, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Medardo de Jesús Henao del Río:
Bishop Medardo de Jesús Henao del Río M.X.Y. (born ) Vicar Apostolic of Mitú

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of Mitú.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2013
  • ob/c2: CB, 24 Nov 2013
  • c1: CB, 29 Nov 2013
  • ob/i: CB, 15 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 16 Dec 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,099

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015